EP0361952 - Catalytic washcoat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PROTOTECH COMPANY 70 Jaconnet Street Newton Highlands, MA 02161 / US | [1990/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bar-Ilan, Amiram 70 Jaconnet Street Newton Highlands, MA / US | 02 /
Morrill, Martin E., III 188 Lincoln Street Stoughton, MA / US | [1990/14] | Representative(s) | Allsop, John Rowland Rowland Allsop & Co. 9 Rickamnsworth Road Watford Hertfordshire WD1 7HE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | Allsop, John Rowland European Patent Attorney 10 London End Beaconsfield, Bucks. HP9 2JH / GB | ||
Former [1990/14] | Allsop, John Rowland European Patent Attorney 10 London End Beaconsfield, Bucks. HP9 2JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 89309962.2 | 29.09.1989 | [1990/14] | Priority number, date | US19880251312 | 30.09.1988 Original published format: US 251312 | [1990/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0361952 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0361952 | Date: | 08.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B01J37/02 | [1990/14] | CPC: |
B01J37/0221 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/14] | Title | German: | Katalytischer Überzug | [1990/14] | English: | Catalytic washcoat | [1990/14] | French: | Revêtement catalytique | [1990/14] | Examination procedure | 08.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/45] | 04.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 16.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/26] | Request for further processing for: | 16.03.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 16.03.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.04.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.07.1992 | BE | 08.07.1992 | CH | 08.07.1992 | ES | 08.07.1992 | FR | 08.07.1992 | GR | 08.07.1992 | IT | 08.07.1992 | LI | 08.07.1992 | NL | 08.07.1992 | LU | 30.09.1992 | [2004/35] |
Former [2002/24] | AT | 08.07.1992 | |
BE | 08.07.1992 | ||
CH | 08.07.1992 | ||
ES | 08.07.1992 | ||
GR | 08.07.1992 | ||
IT | 08.07.1992 | ||
LI | 08.07.1992 | ||
NL | 08.07.1992 | ||
LU | 30.09.1992 | ||
FR | 27.11.1992 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 08.07.1992 | |
BE | 08.07.1992 | ||
CH | 08.07.1992 | ||
GR | 08.07.1992 | ||
IT | 08.07.1992 | ||
LI | 08.07.1992 | ||
NL | 08.07.1992 | ||
LU | 30.09.1992 | ||
FR | 27.11.1992 | ||
Former [1999/52] | AT | 08.07.1992 | |
BE | 08.07.1992 | ||
CH | 08.07.1992 | ||
IT | 08.07.1992 | ||
LI | 08.07.1992 | ||
NL | 08.07.1992 | ||
LU | 30.09.1992 | ||
FR | 27.11.1992 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 08.07.1992 | |
BE | 08.07.1992 | ||
CH | 08.07.1992 | ||
IT | 08.07.1992 | ||
LI | 08.07.1992 | ||
NL | 08.07.1992 | ||
FR | 27.11.1992 | ||
Former [1993/22] | AT | 08.07.1992 | |
BE | 08.07.1992 | ||
CH | 08.07.1992 | ||
LI | 08.07.1992 | ||
NL | 08.07.1992 | ||
FR | 27.11.1992 | ||
Former [1993/16] | AT | 08.07.1992 | |
BE | 08.07.1992 | ||
CH | 08.07.1992 | ||
LI | 08.07.1992 | ||
NL | 08.07.1992 | ||
Former [1993/15] | AT | 08.07.1992 | |
CH | 08.07.1992 | ||
LI | 08.07.1992 | ||
NL | 08.07.1992 | ||
Former [1993/14] | CH | 08.07.1992 | |
LI | 08.07.1992 | ||
NL | 08.07.1992 | ||
Former [1993/03] | CH | 08.07.1992 | |
LI | 08.07.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0002651 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]); | [Y]EP0123293 (DU PONT [US]); | [Y]EP0142858 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]); | [A]WO8503240 (EKA AB [SE]); | [A]US4762567 (RETALLICK WILLIAM B [US]) |