EP0361958 - Ignition mechanism for an instantly heating container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.1994 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.1994 [1994/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSIN SHOKUHIN KABUSHIKI KAISHA 4-1-1 Nishinakajima Yodogawa-ku Osaka 532 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | For all designated states NISSIN SHOKUHIN KABUSHIKI KAISHA 4-1-1 Nishinakajima Yodogawa-ku Osaka 532 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Ryoichi 2-18-12 Fujizuka, Kohoku-ku Yokohama 222 / JP | 02 /
Maiya, Mitsuo 3-9-23 Inokashira, Mitaka Tokyo 181 / JP | 03 /
Kuwahara, Motoo 8-82-2 Kasshi-cho Kamaishi 026 / JP | 04 /
Yamauchi, Kunio 460 Jizou-cho Hikone 522 / JP | 05 /
Kawabata, Choji 1049-29 Aoyagi Tatebayashi 374 / JP | 06 /
Takeuchi, Akira 3-6-58-1 Oaza Higashikata Fukaya 366 / JP | [1990/14] | Representative(s) | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89309974.7 | 29.09.1989 | [1990/14] | Priority number, date | JP19880244365 | 30.09.1988 Original published format: JP 24436588 | [1990/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0361958 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A47J36/30 | [1990/14] | CPC: |
A47J36/30 (EP,US);
F24V30/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/14] | Title | German: | Zündvorrichtung für selbstheizenden Behälter | [1990/14] | English: | Ignition mechanism for an instantly heating container | [1990/14] | French: | Dispositif d'allumage pour récipient autochauffant | [1990/14] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 04.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/44] | 14.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/24] | 20.01.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/24] | Request for further processing for: | 11.02.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 11.02.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.06.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1952637 (ELBATAINER KUNSTSTOFF); | [X]US2896607 (ADOLF EDER); | [X]US3662741 (LICHER ROBERT J); | [A]US2020292 (FELIX EGGERT, et al); | [A]DE3126518 (FUERST HEINZ); | [A]GB579046 (WALTER ANDERSON CALDWELL, et al) |