EP0366281 - Valve system and arrangement for on-line valve replacement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROSS OPERATING VALVE COMPANY 1250 Kirts Boulevard Troy, MI 48007 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/18] | For all designated states ROSS OPERATING VALVE COMPANY 1250 Kirts Boulevard Troy Michigan 48007 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cameron, Russell John 5870 Adams Road Rochester Michigan 48064 / US | 02 /
Krape, Richard P. 2420 Brabant Lake Orion Michigan 48035 / US | 03 /
Winsand, Robert Neil 909 Tottenham Birmingham Michigan 48008 / US | [1990/18] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [1994/09] | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1990/18] | Williams, Trevor John J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5EU / GB | Application number, filing date | 89310053.7 | 02.10.1989 | [1990/18] | Priority number, date | US19880263690 | 28.10.1988 Original published format: US 263690 | [1990/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0366281 | Date: | 02.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0366281 | Date: | 23.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F15B18/00, F15B20/00 | [1990/18] | CPC: |
F15B18/00 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87716 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87764 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87885 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1990/18] | Title | German: | Ventilsystem und Anordnung zum Austauschen von Ventilen während des Betriebes | [1990/18] | English: | Valve system and arrangement for on-line valve replacement | [1990/18] | French: | Système de soupape et dispositif pour remplacer les soupapes pendant le fonctionnement | [1990/18] | Examination procedure | 25.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/29] | 26.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1426501 ; | [A]FR2307151 (CROUZET SA [FR]); | [A]US4280531 (MILBERGER LIONEL J, et al); | [A]CH643919 (FESTO MASCHF STOLL G [DE]); | [A]CH666943 (FESTO MASCHF STOLL G) | Examination | US2635584 |