EP0366282 - Cavity packages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.11.1995 [1995/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DOW CORNING S.A. Parc Industriel B-6198 Seneffe / BE | [1990/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paquet, René Louis Mathieu André Avenue du Forgeron 3 B-1428 Lillois / BE | [1990/18] | Representative(s) | Bullows, Michael Dow Corning Limited, Cardiff Road Barry, South Glamorgan CF63 7YL Wales / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/18] | Bullows, Michael Dow Corning Limited, Cardiff Road Barry, South Glamorgan CF63 7YL, Wales / GB | Application number, filing date | 89310097.4 | 03.10.1989 | [1990/18] | Priority number, date | GB19880025201 | 27.10.1988 Original published format: GB 8825201 | [1990/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0366282 | Date: | 02.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0366282 | Date: | 17.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0366282 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/24, H01L23/31 | [1990/18] | CPC: |
H01L23/24 (EP);
H01L23/296 (EP);
H01L2224/48091 (EP);
H01L2224/48247 (EP)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/18] | Title | German: | Hohlgehäuse | [1994/48] | English: | Cavity packages | [1990/18] | French: | Boitiers à cavité | [1994/48] |
Former [1990/18] | Hohlpackungen | ||
Former [1990/18] | Empaquetages à cavité | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 09.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP62111453 ; | [Y]EP0216352 ; | [Y]EP0186099 ; | [A]EP0006509 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 320 (E-550)(2767) 17 October 1987, & JP-A-62 111 453 (HITACHI LTD.) 22 May 1987,, & JP62111453 A 19870522 | [A] - 1988 Proceedings of the 38th Electronic Components Conference,May 9-11,1988,Los Angeles, CA,US pages 452 - 456; H.ISHIDA ET AL.: "Characterization of a Silicone Gel as a Coating Use for Corrosion Protection" | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPONENTS,HYBRIDS,AND MANUFACTURING TECHNOLOGY vol. 7, no. 3, September 1984, NEW YORK US pages 249 - 256; K.OTSUKA ET AL.: "A New Silicone Gel Sealing Mechanism for High Reliability Encapsulation" |