EP0364215 - Plasma etching apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.11.1993 [1993/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ANELVA CORPORATION 8-1 Yotsuya 5-chome Fuchu-shi Tokyo 183 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/16] | For all designated states ANELVA CORPORATION 8-1 Yotsuya 5-chome Fuchu-shi Tokyo 183 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsukada, Tsutomu c/o Anelva Corp. 8-1 Yotsuya 5-chome Fuchu-shi 183 Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Asamaki, Tatsuo c/o Anelva Corp. 8-1 Yotsuya 5-chome Fuchu-shi 183 Tokyo / JP | [1990/16] | Representative(s) | Crisp, David Norman, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/16] | Crisp, David Norman, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 89310354.9 | 10.10.1989 | [1990/16] | Priority number, date | JP19880255541 | 11.10.1988 Original published format: JP 25554188 | [1990/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0364215 | Date: | 18.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0364215 | Date: | 09.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/32 | [1990/16] | CPC: |
H01J37/3244 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/16] | Title | German: | Plasmaätzgerät | [1990/16] | English: | Plasma etching apparatus | [1990/16] | French: | Appareil de gravure pour plasma | [1990/16] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 19.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/08] | 04.05.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/44] | 08.06.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.11.1992 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58006134 ; | [A]EP0210605 ; | [A]US4612432 ; | [A]EP0019370 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 76 (E-167)(1221) 30 March 1983; & JP-A-58 006 134 (SUWA SEIKOSHA K.K.) 13 January 1983,, & JP58006134 A 19830113 |