EP0422299 - Memory with page mode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.1995 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.08.1995 [1995/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/16] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
West, Roderick Michael Peters 1 Balmoral Close North Millers Dale Chandlers Ford Hampshire. SO5 1TG / GB | 02 /
Bates, Matthew Damian 4 Burns Place Coxford Close Shirley Southampton Hampshire. SO1 6DA / GB | 03 /
Gay, Adrian Charles 29 Fareham Park Road Fareham Hampshire. PO15 6LE / GB | 04 /
Williams, Todd IBM General Technology Division Essex Junction Vermont. 05452 / US | [1991/16] | Representative(s) | Burt, Roger James IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/16] | Burt, Roger James, Dr. IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 89310459.6 | 12.10.1989 | [1991/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0422299 | Date: | 17.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0422299 | Date: | 07.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G09G1/16, G11C7/00, G11C11/409 | [1994/36] | CPC: |
G09G5/393 (EP);
G11C11/4096 (EP);
G11C7/1021 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/16] | G11C7/00, G11C11/409, G09G1/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/16] | Title | German: | Speicher mit Seitenmodus | [1991/16] | English: | Memory with page mode | [1991/16] | French: | Mémoire avec mode de page | [1991/16] | Examination procedure | 13.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/16] | 07.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4546451 ; | [A]WO8204147 |