EP0365232 - Integrated liquid crystal display and optical touch panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.1992 | Change - applicant | published on 30.09.1992 [1992/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEKTRONIX INC. Howard Vollum Park 14150 S.W. Karl Braun Drive P.O.Box 500, Mail Stop 50-PAT Beaverton Oregon 97077-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | For all designated states TEKTRONIX INC. Howard Vollum Park 14150 S.W. Karl Braun Drive P.O.Box 500, Mail Stop 50-PAT Beaverton Oregon 97077-0001 / US | ||
Former [1990/17] | For all designated states TEKTRONIX, INC. Wilsonville Industrial Park, 26600 S.W. Parkway Avenue Wilsonville, Oregon 97070-1000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meadows, David R. 15115 S W Barlow Court Beaverton Oregon 97007 / US | [1990/17] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, Malcolm Graham, et al Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Bakers Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/17] | Lawrence, Malcolm Graham, et al Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Bakers Lane Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89310529.6 | 13.10.1989 | [1990/17] | Priority number, date | US19880258420 | 17.10.1988 Original published format: US 258420 | [1990/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0365232 | Date: | 25.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0365232 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G06K11/08, G06F3/033, G02F1/133 | [1990/21] | CPC: |
G06F3/0412 (EP,US);
G06F3/0421 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/17] | G06K11/08, G02F1/133 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/17] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitskristallanzeige, integriert mit optischem Eingabeschirm | [1990/17] | English: | Integrated liquid crystal display and optical touch panel | [1990/17] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage à cristaux liquides intégré avec écran tactile optique | [1990/17] | File destroyed: | 09.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 14.12.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/48] | 02.07.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2486267 (HEWLETT PACKARD FRANCE SA [FR]); | [A]US4459476 (WEISSMUELLER WILLIAM W [US], et al); | [X]EP0137619 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]); | [Y]GB2162673 (SHARP KK); | [X]DE3625444 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) |