EP0367498 - Photographic material and process comprising a pyrazoloazole dyeforming coupler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 15.10.1997 [1997/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/19] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harder, John William c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Department 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650 / US | [1990/19] | Representative(s) | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/11] | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [1990/19] | Baron, Paul Alexander Clifford, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 89311052.8 | 26.10.1989 | [1990/19] | Priority number, date | US19880265155 | 31.10.1988 Original published format: US 265155 | [1990/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0367498 | Date: | 09.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0367498 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0367498 | Date: | 19.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/327, G03C7/38 | [1990/19] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
G03C7/327 (EP,US);
G03C7/3835 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | GB [1995/52] |
Former [1990/19] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Photographisches Material und Verfahren mit einem farbstoffbildenden Pyrazoloazolkuppler | [1990/19] | English: | Photographic material and process comprising a pyrazoloazole dyeforming coupler | [1990/19] | French: | Matériau photographique et procédé comprenant un coupleur pyrazoloazole formateur de colorant | [1990/19] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 29.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/52] | 25.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 16.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 26.10.1996 | [1997/42] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4585732 (KAWAGISHI TOSHIO [JP], et al); | [A]EP0284240 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) | Examination | EP0285274 | EP0302700 | EP0320776 | EP0325276 | EP0343557 |