EP0366468 - Connector and interface device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.06.1999 [1999/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/18] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Minerd, Timothy M. 27 Kimberly Road Pittsford New York 14534 / US | [1998/27] |
Former [1990/18] | 01 /
Minnerd, Timothy M. 27 Kimberly Road Pittsford New York 14534 / US | Representative(s) | Johnson, Reginald George, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/19] | Johnson, Reginald George, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | ||
Former [1990/18] | Hill, Cecilia Ann, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 89311063.5 | 26.10.1989 | [1990/18] | Priority number, date | US19880262849 | 26.10.1988 Original published format: US 262849 | [1990/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0366468 | Date: | 02.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0366468 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0366468 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/40, G08C15/12 | [1991/35] | CPC: |
G05B19/0425 (EP,US);
G08C15/12 (EP,US);
G05B2219/21037 (EP,US);
G05B2219/21038 (EP,US);
G05B2219/21076 (EP,US);
G05B2219/21156 (EP,US);
G05B2219/21162 (EP,US);
G05B2219/21168 (EP,US);
G05B2219/21169 (EP,US);
G05B2219/24054 (EP,US);
G05B2219/24117 (EP,US);
G05B2219/24132 (EP,US);
G05B2219/25133 (EP,US);
G05B2219/25315 (EP,US);
G05B2219/25324 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1990/18] | G06F13/40 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/18] | Title | German: | Anschlusspunkt und Schnittstellenvorrichtung | [1990/18] | English: | Connector and interface device | [1990/18] | French: | Connecteur et dispositif interface | [1990/18] | Examination procedure | 24.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/13] | 05.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0150592 (AMP INC [US]); | [Y]FR2406253 (FORD FRANCE [FR]) |