EP0369638 - Sol gel derived ceramic bubbles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.1994 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.11.1994 [1994/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [1990/21] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moh, Kyung H. c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company 2501 Hudson Road St. Paul Minnesota 55144-1000 / US | 02 /
Sowman, Harold G. c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company 2501 Hudson Road St. Paul Minnesota 55144-1000 / US | 03 /
Wood, Thomas E. c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company 2501 Hudson Road St. Paul Minnesota 55144-1000 / US | [1990/21] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/21] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89311275.5 | 01.11.1989 | [1990/21] | Priority number, date | US19880272526 | 17.11.1988 Original published format: US 272526 | [1990/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0369638 | Date: | 23.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0369638 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C04B38/00, B01J2/06, B01J2/08 | [1990/21] | CPC: |
C04B38/009 (EP,US);
C04B35/00 (KR);
B01J2/06 (EP,US);
B01J2/08 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B38/009, C04B38/0045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1990/21] | Title | German: | Im Sol-Gel-Verfahren hergestellte kermaische Kugeln | [1990/21] | English: | Sol gel derived ceramic bubbles | [1990/21] | French: | Bulles céramiques obtenues par la voie sol-gel | [1990/21] | Examination procedure | 20.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/03] | 03.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 04.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 02.11.1993 | [1994/44] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP62191426 ; | [A]US3442821 (HILFMAN LEE); | [XD]US4349456 (SOWMAN HAROLD G); | [A]EP0224375 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 107, no. 20, November 1987, page 389, abstract no. 182128f, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-62 191 426 (E. KATO) 21-08-1987, & JP62191426 A 00000000 |