EP0371644 - Surface mount technology breakaway self regulating temperature heater [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1994 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/04] | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | ||
Former [1990/23] | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED P.O. Box 3608 470 Friendship Road Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Henschen, Homer Ernst 624 Belvedere Street Carlisle Pennsylvania 17013 / US | 02 /
McKee, Michael John 11 Terrace Place New Cumberland Pennsylvania 17070 / US | 03 /
Pawlikowski, Joseph Michael 3044 Westwood Drive Lancaster Pennsylvania 17601 / US | [1990/23] | Representative(s) | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith, London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/23] | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 89311649.1 | 10.11.1989 | [1990/23] | Priority number, date | US19880277362 | 29.11.1988 Original published format: US 277362 | [1990/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0371644 | Date: | 06.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0371644 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B23K3/04, H05B3/12, H01R43/02 | [1990/23] | CPC: |
B23K3/0475 (EP,US);
H01R4/02 (EP,KR,US);
H01R43/02 (KR);
H01R43/0242 (EP,US);
H05B3/12 (EP,US);
H05K1/0212 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10189 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10924 (EP,US);
H05K2203/1115 (EP,US);
H05K3/3494 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/23] | Title | German: | Abbrechbares selbstregulierendes Heizelement für die Oberflächenmontagetechnik | [1990/23] | English: | Surface mount technology breakaway self regulating temperature heater | [1990/23] | French: | Dispositif de chauffage auto-régulateur séparable par rupture pour technique de montage en surface | [1990/23] | Examination procedure | 24.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/03] | 09.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 11.08.1993 | IT | 11.08.1993 | [2004/35] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 11.08.1993 | |
FR | 31.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | FR | 31.12.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0158434 (METCAL INC [US]); | [A]EP0198697 (PLESSEY OVERSEAS [GB]); | [A]EP0206620 (METCAL INC [US]); | [A]EP0250094 (METCAL INC [US]) |