EP0370668 - Modular rigid inflatable aquatic vessel structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.1995 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cochran, William H. 40 Buttonwood Street Bristol Rhode Island 02809-0810 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/22] | For all designated states Cochran, William H. 40 Buttonwood Street Bristol Rhode Island 02809-0810 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/22] | Representative(s) | Needle, Jacqueline, et al Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/22] | Needle, Jacqueline, et al W.H. BECK, GREENER & CO 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89311705.1 | 13.11.1989 | [1990/22] | Priority number, date | US19880277381 | 29.11.1988 Original published format: US 277381 | [1990/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0370668 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0370668 | Date: | 25.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B63B7/08 | [1990/22] | CPC: |
B63B7/082 (EP,US);
B63B7/087 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/22] | Title | German: | Modularer, starrer aufblasbarer Aufbau eines Wasserfahrzeuges | [1990/22] | English: | Modular rigid inflatable aquatic vessel structure | [1990/22] | French: | Structure d'engin aquatique modulaire rigide gonflable | [1990/22] | Examination procedure | 14.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/45] | 30.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.05.1994 | BE | 25.05.1994 | CH | 25.05.1994 | DE | 25.05.1994 | ES | 25.05.1994 | FR | 25.05.1994 | GR | 25.05.1994 | IT | 25.05.1994 | LI | 25.05.1994 | NL | 25.05.1994 | SE | 25.05.1994 | LU | 30.11.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/24] | AT | 25.05.1994 | |
BE | 25.05.1994 | ||
CH | 25.05.1994 | ||
DE | 25.05.1994 | ||
ES | 25.05.1994 | ||
GR | 25.05.1994 | ||
IT | 25.05.1994 | ||
LI | 25.05.1994 | ||
NL | 25.05.1994 | ||
SE | 25.05.1994 | ||
FR | 21.10.1994 | ||
LU | 30.11.1994 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 25.05.1994 | |
BE | 25.05.1994 | ||
CH | 25.05.1994 | ||
DE | 25.05.1994 | ||
GR | 25.05.1994 | ||
IT | 25.05.1994 | ||
LI | 25.05.1994 | ||
NL | 25.05.1994 | ||
SE | 25.05.1994 | ||
FR | 21.10.1994 | ||
LU | 30.11.1994 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 25.05.1994 | |
BE | 25.05.1994 | ||
CH | 25.05.1994 | ||
DE | 25.05.1994 | ||
GR | 25.05.1994 | ||
IT | 25.05.1994 | ||
LI | 25.05.1994 | ||
NL | 25.05.1994 | ||
FR | 21.10.1994 | ||
LU | 30.11.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 25.05.1994 | |
BE | 25.05.1994 | ||
CH | 25.05.1994 | ||
DE | 25.05.1994 | ||
IT | 25.05.1994 | ||
LI | 25.05.1994 | ||
NL | 25.05.1994 | ||
FR | 21.10.1994 | ||
Former [1995/24] | AT | 25.05.1994 | |
BE | 25.05.1994 | ||
CH | 25.05.1994 | ||
DE | 25.05.1994 | ||
LI | 25.05.1994 | ||
NL | 25.05.1994 | ||
FR | 21.10.1994 | ||
Former [1995/13] | AT | 25.05.1994 | |
BE | 25.05.1994 | ||
CH | 25.05.1994 | ||
DE | 25.05.1994 | ||
LI | 25.05.1994 | ||
NL | 25.05.1994 | ||
Former [1995/11] | AT | 25.05.1994 | |
BE | 25.05.1994 | ||
CH | 25.05.1994 | ||
DE | 25.05.1994 | ||
LI | 25.05.1994 | ||
Former [1995/03] | AT | 25.05.1994 | |
CH | 25.05.1994 | ||
DE | 25.05.1994 | ||
LI | 25.05.1994 | ||
Former [1995/02] | AT | 25.05.1994 | |
CH | 25.05.1994 | ||
LI | 25.05.1994 | ||
Former [1994/48] | CH | 25.05.1994 | |
LI | 25.05.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AU32007B ; | [X]US2338976 (WILLI SCHUTTE); | [A]FR2063706 (LACOUR CHRISTIAN, et al); | [A]US3881442 (SEIPLE RONALD L); | [A]GB2001586 (ZODIAC); | [A]FR2564415 (ZODIAC [FR]); | [X]GB2161118 (GALT GLASS LAMINATES LIMITED); | [A]EP0193874 (METZELER KAUTSCHUK [DE]); | [YD]US4724792 (COCHRAN WILLIAM H [US]) |