30.07.2004 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] |
26.04.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] |
23.12.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] |
11.12.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] |
06.03.1998 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.04.1998 [1998/17] |
30.01.1998 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.1998 [1998/12] |
16.01.1998 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.1998 [1998/10] |
05.12.1997 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.01.1998 [1998/04] |
21.11.1997 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] |
14.03.1997 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.05.1997 [1997/18] |
20.12.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.11.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.10.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.09.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
23.05.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
19.02.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
30.03.1995 |
First examination report |
|
09.02.1995 |
Change - applicant |
published on 29.03.1995 [1995/13] |
26.08.1993 |
Publication of search report |
published on 13.10.1993 [1993/41] |
19.05.1990 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.07.1990 [1990/27] |
19.05.1990 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.07.1990 [1990/27] |