EP0371677 - Image signal processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.1996 [1996/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | For all designated states NIPPON HOSO KYOKAI 2-1, Jinnan 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/02] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | ||
For all designated states NIPPON HOSO KYOKAI 2-1, Jinnan 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150 / JP | |||
Former [1990/23] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006 Ohazakadoma Kadoma, Osaka 571 / JP | ||
For all designated states NIPPON HOSO KYOKAI 2-1, Jinnan 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Isobe, Mitsuo 2-18-1204, Uchindaicho-2-chome Miyakojima-ku Osaka-shi / JP | 02 /
Hamada, Masanori 35-33, Nozatocho Kadoma-shi / JP | 03 /
Morita, Katsumi 23-A-204, Shinashiyakami Suita-shi / JP | 04 /
Ninomiya, Yuichi 17-4, Takaishi 2-chome Asao-ku Kawasaki-shi / JP | [1990/23] | Representative(s) | Votier, Sidney David, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [1990/23] | Application number, filing date | 89312065.9 | 21.11.1989 | [1990/23] | Priority number, date | JP19880294927 | 22.11.1988 Original published format: JP 29492788 | [1990/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0371677 | Date: | 06.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0371677 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0371677 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/24 | [1995/21] | CPC: |
H04N5/144 (EP,US);
H04N7/01 (KR);
H04N5/46 (EP,US);
H04N7/0152 (EP,US);
H04N7/24 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/23] | H04N7/13 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/23] | Title | German: | Bildsignalverarbeitungsvorrichtung | [1990/23] | English: | Image signal processing apparatus | [1990/23] | French: | Appareil de traitement de signal d'image | [1990/23] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 22.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP62206977 ; | [AP]JP63281585 ; | [A]EP0263375 (JAPAN BROADCASTING CORP [JP]) | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 063 (E-585) 25 February 1988, & JP-A-62 206977 (TOSHIBA CORP) 11 September 1987,, & JP62206977 A 19870911 | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 110 (E-728) 16 March 1989, & JP-A-63 281585 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) 18 November 1988,, & JP63281585 A 19881118 |