blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0372758

EP0372758 - Highly filled compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.02.1995
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip01.02.1995Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.03.1995 [1995/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Du Pont Canada Inc.
Box 2200, Streetsville Postal Station Mississauga
Ontario L5M 2H3 / CA
For all designated states
811654 ONTARIO INC.
1194 Caledonia Road Unit C Toronto
Ontario M6A 2W5 / CA
[N/P]
Former [1992/31]For all designated states
Du Pont Canada Inc.
Box 2200, Streetsville Postal Station
Mississauga, Ontario L5M 2H3 / CA
For all designated states
811654 ONTARIO INC.
1194 Caledonia Road Unit C
Toronto Ontario M6A 2W5 / CA
Former [1991/02]For all designated states
Du Pont Canada Inc.
Box 2200, Streetsville Postal Station
Mississauga, Ontario L5M 2H3 / CA
For all designated states
Lilley, Martin John
445 St Clements Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5N 1M2 / CA
Former [1990/24]For all designated states
DU PONT CANADA INC.
Box 2200 Streetsville
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2H3 / CA
For all designated states
Lilley, Martin John
445 St Clements Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5N 1M2 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / MacLeod, John Murdo
P.O.Box 187, Kingston
Ontario K7L 4V8 / CA
02 / Servant, Raymond Hector
2919 Appleton Court Oakville
Ontario L6V 6S5 / CA
[1990/24]
Representative(s)Harrison, David Christopher, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1990/24]Harrison, David Christopher, et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date89312179.823.11.1989
[1990/24]
Priority number, dateGB1988002753125.11.1988         Original published format: GB 8827531
[1990/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0372758
Date:13.06.1990
Language:EN
[1990/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.04.1990
ClassificationIPC:C08K3/00, C08L23/08, C08L51/06, G21F1/10
[1990/24]
CPC:
G21F1/106 (EP); C08K3/013 (EP); C08K3/08 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1990/24]
TitleGerman:Hochgefüllte Zusammensetzungen[1990/24]
English:Highly filled compositions[1990/24]
French:Compositions à teneur élevée en charges[1990/24]
File destroyed:03.03.2001
Examination procedure05.11.1990Examination requested  [1991/02]
29.09.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.07.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.01.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.09.1994Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1995/12]
26.10.1994Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1995/12]
Request for further processing for:21.07.1993Request for further processing filed
21.07.1993Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
09.08.1993Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.199406   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchDE1127581  [ ];
 EP0339760  [ ];
 EP0242294  [ ];
 CH666757  [ ];
 DE1913099  [ ]
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.