Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
09.10.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.1995 [1995/48] |
24.11.1993 | First examination report | |
21.07.1992 | Request for examination filed | published on 09.09.1992 [1992/37] |
27.11.1991 | Publication of search report | published on 15.01.1992 [1992/03] |
13.04.1990 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 30.05.1990 [1990/22] |