Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR930003799B | 13.05.1993 | B1 | Priority number | Date | KR890016333 | 11.11.1989 | KR930000831 | 21.01.1993 | JP29792388 | 25.11.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0370820 | Global Dossier | 15.01.1992 | A3 | EP0370820 | 30.05.1990 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP29792388 | 25.11.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR8905940 | 19.06.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | JP29792388 | 25.11.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2002457 | 25.05.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP29792388 | 25.11.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH07106750B | 15.11.1995 | B2 | JPH02152659 | 12.06.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | JP29792388 | 25.11.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR930003798B | 13.05.1993 | B1 | KR900007953 | 02.06.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | JP29792388 | 25.11.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5120586 | 09.06.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | JP29792388 | 25.11.1988 |