blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0372800

EP0372800 - Manufacturing method for a heat-sensitive transfer recording material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1990/24]Heat-sensitive recording material, its manufacturing method image forming process
[1996/10]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.01.1997
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 02.01.2008  [2008/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KONICA CORPORATION
26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 160 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1990/24]For all designated states
KONICA CORPORATION
26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 160 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Koshizuka, Kunihiro
Konica Corporation 1 Sakura-machi
Hino-shi Tokyo / JP
02 / Abe, Takao
Konica Corporation 1 Sakura-machi
Hino-shi Tokyo / JP
[1990/24]
Representative(s)Brock, Peter William, et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 1 Richfield Place Richfield Avenue Reading RG1 8EQ
Berkshire / GB
[N/P]
Former [1990/24]Brock, Peter William, et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 1 Richfield Place Richfield Avenue
Reading RG1 8EQ Berkshire / GB
Application number, filing date89312373.728.11.1989
[1990/24]
Priority number, dateJP1988030518702.12.1988         Original published format: JP 30518788
JP1988030531102.12.1988         Original published format: JP 30531188
JP1988030859606.12.1988         Original published format: JP 30859688
JP1989008772306.04.1989         Original published format: JP 8772389
[1990/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0372800
Date:13.06.1990
Language:EN
[1990/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0372800
Date:05.06.1991
Language:EN
[1991/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0372800
Date:06.03.1996
Language:EN
[1996/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.04.1991
ClassificationIPC:B41M5/38
[1990/24]
CPC:
B41M5/38207 (EP); B41M5/41 (EP); B41M5/42 (EP);
B41M5/443 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT [1990/24]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines wärmeempfindlichen Übertragungsaufzeichnungsmaterials[1996/10]
English:Manufacturing method for a heat-sensitive transfer recording material[1996/10]
French:Méthode pour la fabrication d' un matériau d'enregistrement par transfert thermique[1996/10]
Former [1990/24]Wärmeempfindliches Aufzeichnungsmaterial, Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung und Bildaufzeichnungsprozess
Former [1990/24]Heat-sensitive recording material, its manufacturing method image forming process
Former [1990/24]Matériau d'enregistrement thermosensible, méthode pour sa fabrication et procédé pour la formation d'images
Examination procedure05.11.1991Examination requested  [1992/01]
04.10.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.02.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.07.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.08.1995Fee for grant paid
04.08.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.12.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1997/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.11.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
09.10.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
08.11.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
15.11.1994Renewal fee patent year 06
09.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT06.03.1996
DE08.06.1996
[2008/01]
Former [1999/42]IT06.03.1996
DE08.06.1996
Former [1996/44]DE08.06.1996
Documents cited:Search[X]JP62280084  ;
 [XP]JP01258989  ;
 [X]EP0249195  ;
 [A]GB2044473
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 164 (M-698)(3011) 18 May 1988, & JP-A-62 280084 (DAINIPPON PRINTING COMPANY LIMITED) 04 December 1987,, & JP62280084 A 19871204
 [XP]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 13 (M-918)(3956) 11 January 1990, & JP-A-01 258989 (UNION KEMIKAA K.K.) 16 October 1989,, & JP01258989 A 19891016
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.