EP0372941 - Anti-inflammatory 5-hydroxy-2-furanones [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.1995 [1995/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, CA 92612 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/24] | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, California 92715 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Gary C. M. 24722 Mendocino Ct. Laguna Hills California 92653 / US | [1990/24] | Representative(s) | Hutchins, Michael Richard, et al Graham Watt & Co. London Road Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/24] | Hutchins, Michael Richard, et al Graham Watt & Co. London Road Riverhead Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 89312738.1 | 07.12.1989 | [1990/24] | Priority number, date | US19880281154 | 07.12.1988 Original published format: US 281154 | [1990/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0372941 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0372941 | Date: | 06.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07D307/60, C07D405/12, C07F9/09, A61K31/365 | [1990/24] | CPC: |
C07D405/12 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
C07D307/60 (EP);
C07F7/0814 (EP);
C07F9/65515 (EP);
C07F9/65586 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/24] | Title | German: | Entzündungshemmende 5-Hydroxy-2-furanone | [1990/24] | English: | Anti-inflammatory 5-hydroxy-2-furanones | [1990/24] | French: | 5-Hydroxy-2-furanones anti-inflammatoires | [1990/24] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 05.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/40] | 20.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.01.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 07.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/52] | 28.07.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1995/52] | Request for further processing for: | 14.03.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 14.03.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.04.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1994 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8705019 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]); | [E]EP0372940 (ALLERGAN INC [US]) |