EP0372976 - Zoom lens apparatus with lens units for zooming and focusing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.07.1996 [1996/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/24] | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inadome, Kiyotaka No. 101 Watanabe Bldg. 312, Idanakanomachi Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Imanari, Hitoshi 9-1-A606 Shinsaku 5-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Fukino, Kunihiro 2-1 Muraoka Higashi 2-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Takayama, Toru 27-4 Enokigaoka Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1990/24] | Representative(s) | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/24] | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89312796.9 | 08.12.1989 | [1990/24] | Priority number, date | JP19880311494 | 08.12.1988 Original published format: JP 31149488 | JP19880143819 | 06.06.1989 Original published format: JP 14381988 | [1990/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0372976 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0372976 | Date: | 02.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G02B7/10, G02B15/14 | [1990/24] | CPC: |
G02B7/282 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/24] | Title | German: | Zoomlinsenvorrichtung mit Linseneinheiten zum Zoomen und Fokussieren | [1990/24] | English: | Zoom lens apparatus with lens units for zooming and focusing | [1990/24] | French: | Dispositif à focale variable avec groupes de lentilles pour le réglage de la distance focale et la mise au point | [1990/24] | Examination procedure | 26.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/52] | 29.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1597417 (SCHNEIDER CO OPTISCHE WERKE); | [A]DE3127140 (CANON KK [JP]); | [X]GB2084346 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND); | [A]DE3304010 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]); | [A]DE3305688 (MINOLTA CAMERA KK [JP]); | [A]DE3426186 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]); | [Y]US4729644 (UEYAMA MASAYUKI [JP]); | [A]EP0273382 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]) |