Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0375230 | Global Dossier | 29.03.1995 | B1 | EP0375230 | 29.08.1990 | A3 | EP0375230 | 27.06.1990 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US28620788 | 19.12.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE68921968D1 | 04.05.1995 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US28620788 | 19.12.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH02259495 | 22.10.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | US28620788 | 19.12.1988 |