EP0375230 - Self-acting safety for nuclear reactors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaplan, Samuel 111 Vista Del Prado Los Gatos California 95030 / US | 02 /
Murata, Ronald Edward 418 Pin Oak Drive Sunnyvale California 94086 / US | [1990/26] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/13] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1990/26] | Smith, Thomas Ian Macdonald London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Burdett House 15-16 Buckingham Street London WC2N 6DU / GB | Application number, filing date | 89312874.4 | 11.12.1989 | [1990/26] | Priority number, date | US19880286207 | 19.12.1988 Original published format: US 286207 | [1990/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0375230 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0375230 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0375230 | Date: | 29.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G21C9/02 | [1990/26] | CPC: |
G21C9/02 (EP);
Y02E30/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/26] | Title | German: | Selbsttätige Sicherheitseinrichtung für Kernreaktor | [1990/26] | English: | Self-acting safety for nuclear reactors | [1990/26] | French: | Dispositif de sécurité auto-actionné pour réacteur nucléaire | [1990/26] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 10.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/07] | 03.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 29.03.1995 | IT | 29.03.1995 | DE | 30.06.1995 | GB | 11.12.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 29.03.1995 | |
DE | 30.06.1995 | ||
FR | 25.08.1995 | ||
GB | 11.12.1995 | ||
Former [1997/14] | DE | 30.06.1995 | |
FR | 25.08.1995 | ||
GB | 11.12.1995 | ||
Former [1996/01] | DE | 30.06.1995 | |
FR | 25.08.1995 | ||
Former [1995/52] | FR | 25.08.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2185345 (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK); | [A]FR1211272 (KERNREAKTOR BAU UND BETR S GES); | [A]FR2353929 (ALSACIENNE ATOM [FR]); | [A]FR1487533 (ENGLISH ELECTRIC CO LTD) |