EP0375234 - Nonwoven filter material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 19.01.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Change - representative | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [1990/26] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Winters, John C. c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company 2501 Hudson Road P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul Minn. 55133-3427 / US | [1990/26] | Representative(s) | Hill, Cecilia Ann, et al 3M United Kingdom PLC 3M Centre Cain Road Bracknell Berkshire RG12 8HT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/42] | Hill, Cecilia Ann, et al 3M United Kingdom PLC 3M Centre Cain Road Bracknell Berkshire RG12 8HT / GB | ||
Former [2009/31] | Hill, Cecilia Ann, et al 3M United Kingdom PLC 3M Centre Cain Road Bracknell Berks RG12 8HT / BE | ||
Former [1996/23] | Hill, Cecilia Ann, et al 3M Office of Intellectual Property Counsel 3M Europe S.A./N.V. Hermeslaan 7 B-1831 Diegem / BE | ||
Former [1996/02] | Molyneaux, Martyn William, et al c/o Ladas & Parry 52-54 High Holborn GB-London WC1V 6RR / GB | ||
Former [1990/26] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89312886.8 | 11.12.1989 | [1990/26] | Priority number, date | US19880288294 | 22.12.1988 Original published format: US 288294 | [1990/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0375234 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0375234 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B01D39/16, D04H5/08, B32B5/26 | [1990/26] | CPC: |
B32B5/26 (EP,US);
A47L9/14 (EP,US);
B01D39/08 (EP,US);
B01D39/1623 (EP,US);
B03C3/28 (EP,US);
B32B5/022 (US);
D04H1/54 (EP,US);
D04H1/559 (EP,US);
D04H1/56 (EP,US);
D04H3/14 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0435 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0622 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0627 (EP,US);
B01D2239/1233 (EP,US);
B01D2239/1258 (EP,US);
B32B2262/0253 (US);
B32B2509/00 (US);
Y10S428/903 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, NL, SE [1990/26] | Title | German: | Nichtgewebtes Filtermaterial | [1990/26] | English: | Nonwoven filter material | [1990/26] | French: | Matériau de filtration non tissé | [1990/26] | Examination procedure | 07.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/01] | 18.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.03.1995
28.03.1995
ADMISSIBLE Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL Opponent's representative Fett, Günter CPW GmbH Postfach 10 01 49 42097 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.03.1995
28.03.1995
ADMISSIBLE Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL Opponent's representative Fett, Günter Acordis AG, Postfach 10 01 49 42097 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [1995/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.03.1995
28.03.1995
ADMISSIBLE Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | 08.05.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.11.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.12.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.01.1997 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.01.1997 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 18.12.2000 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2001/10] | Appeal following opposition | 26.02.1997 | Appeal received No. T0249/97 | 09.05.1997 | Statement of grounds filed | 18.12.2000 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 18.12.2000 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.12.2000 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4589894 (GIN VINCENT M [US], et al); | [A]GB2194255 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO); | [A]WO8601702 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [A]US4631933 (CAREY JR PATRICK H [US]) | Examination | US4215682 | US4650506 | US4011067 |