EP0376561 - Valve control system for internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.08.1993 [1993/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Isuzu Motors Limited 26-1 Minami-ohi 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8524 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/27] | For all designated states Isuzu Motors Limited 6-22-10 Minamiooi Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawamura, Hideo 13-5, Okada 8-chome Samukawa-machi Koza-gun Kanagawa / JP | [1990/27] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/27] | Brunner, Michael John, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 89313159.9 | 15.12.1989 | [1990/27] | Priority number, date | JP19880334963 | 28.12.1988 Original published format: JP 33496388 | [1990/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0376561 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0376561 | Date: | 26.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F01L9/04, F01L13/06 | [1990/27] | CPC: |
F01L13/06 (EP,US);
F01L9/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/27] | Title | German: | Ventilsteuervorrichtung für Brennkraftmaschinen | [1990/27] | English: | Valve control system for internal combustion engine | [1990/27] | French: | Dispositif de commande de soupape pour moteur à combustion interne | [1990/27] | Examination procedure | 30.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/04] | 01.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP6114437 ; | [A]JP58101206 ; | [A]JP6361705 ; | [Y]EP0034209 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG [DE]); | [Y]FR2616481 (HAMON FRANCOIS [FR]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 163 (M-487)(2219) 11 June 1986, & JP-A-61 14437 (MITSUBISHI) 22 January 1986,, & JP6114437 A 19860122 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 203 (M-241)(1348) 08 September 1983, & JP-A-58 101206 (AICHI) 16 June 1983,, & JP58101206 A 19830616 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 286 (M-727)(3133) 05 August 1988, & JP-A-63 61705 (NGK) 17 March 1988,, & JP6361705 A 19880317 | [A] - AUTOMOTIVE ENGINEERING. vol. 96, no. 5, May 1988, WARRENDALE US pages 46 - 53; D.M. KABUT: "Ceramic valve analysis" |