EP0375347 - Sulphonic acid substituted aromatic steroids as inhibitors of steroid 5-alpha-reductase [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.12.1995 [1995/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | ||
Former [1990/26] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holt, Dennis Alan 4450A Gebhart School Road Mohnton, PA 19540 / US | 02 /
Metcalf, Brian Walter 520 Woodland Avenue Radnor, PA 19087 / US | 03 /
Levy, Mark Alan 115 Reveille Road Wayne, PA 19087 / US | [1994/51] |
Former [1990/26] | 01 /
Holt, Dennis Alan 4450A Gebhart School Road Mohnton Pennsylvania 19540 / US | ||
02 /
Metcalf, Brian Walter 520 Woodland Avenue Radnor Pennsylvania 19087 / US | |||
03 /
Levy, Mark Alan 115 Reveille Road Wayne Pennsylvania 19087 / US | Representative(s) | Giddings, Peter John, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | Giddings, Peter John, Dr., et al SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property SB House Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | ||
Former [1990/26] | Giddings, Peter John, Dr. SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property SB House Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 89313260.5 | 19.12.1989 | [1990/26] | Priority number, date | US19880290020 | 23.12.1988 Original published format: US 290020 | [1990/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0375347 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0375347 | Date: | 21.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07J31/00, C07J41/00, A61K31/56 | [1990/26] | CPC: |
C07J31/003 (EP,US);
A61P5/00 (EP);
C07J41/0072 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/26] | Title | German: | Sulfonsäure-substituierte aromatische Steroide als 5-Alpha-Reduktase-Inhibitoren | [1990/26] | English: | Sulphonic acid substituted aromatic steroids as inhibitors of steroid 5-alpha-reductase | [1990/26] | French: | Stéroides aromatiques substitués par l'acide sulfonique, comme inhibiteurs de 5alpha-réductase | [1990/26] | Examination procedure | 13.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 08.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2555579 (VINDIN DEANS SIDNEY ALFRED, et al); | [A]US3117140 (ERICH HECKER); | [A]DE1937519 (FARMACEUTICI ITALIA); | [A]EP0289327 (SMITHKLINE BECKMAN CORP [US]) |