EP0375366 - Method and apparatus using a varying electromagnetic field for determining the nature, or a property of a non-metallic, conductive material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/26] | Method and apparatus using a varying electromagnetic field for determining the nature, or a property of a material | ||
[1994/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.1995 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.10.1995 [1995/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LOMA GROUP LIMITED Summit Avenue Southwood Farnborough Hampshire GU14 ONY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | For all designated states LOMA GROUP LIMITED Summit Avenue Southwood Farnborough Hampshire GU14 ONY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mayo, Geoffrey Turnstones Brook Avenue Warsash Hampshire SO3 6HN / GB | [1990/26] | Representative(s) | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 89313291.0 | 19.12.1989 | [1990/26] | Priority number, date | GB19880029617 | 20.12.1988 Original published format: GB 8829617 | [1990/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0375366 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0375366 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0375366 | Date: | 12.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/02, G01N33/02 | [1990/26] | CPC: |
G01R27/2688 (EP,US);
G01N27/023 (EP,US);
G01N33/025 (EP,US);
G01V3/107 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung der Beschaffenheit oder einer Eigenschaft eines nichtmetallischen, leitfähigen Materials mit Hilfe eines elektromagnetischen Wechselfeldes | [1994/41] | English: | Method and apparatus using a varying electromagnetic field for determining the nature, or a property of a non-metallic, conductive material | [1994/41] | French: | Procédé et dispositif utilisant un champ électromagnétique variable pour déterminer la nature ou une propriété d'un matériau conducteur non-métallique | [1994/41] |
Former [1990/26] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung der Beschaffenheit oder einer Eigenschaft eines Materials mit Hilfe eines wechselnden elektromagnetischen Feldes | ||
Former [1990/26] | Method and apparatus using a varying electromagnetic field for determining the nature, or a property of a material | ||
Former [1990/26] | Procédé et dispositif utilisant un champ électromagnétique variable pour déterminer la nature ou une propriété d'un matériel | Examination procedure | 31.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 16.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 12.10.1994 | LI | 12.10.1994 | [1995/17] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP63009856 ; | [XP]EP0337783 (YAMATO SCALE CO LTD [JP]); | [X]WO8803273 (PEERLESS WINSMITH INC [US]); | [Y]AU528607B (UNIV GEORGETOWN); | [Y]GB2158240 (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD); | [A]US3665302 (LEES ALEXANDER, et al) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 12, No. 210 (P-717)[3057], 16 June 1988; & JP-A-63 009 856 (HIROO KATO) (16-01-1988), & JP63009856 A 19880616 |