EP0375379 - Buckle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.1994 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.1994 [1994/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YOSHIDA KOGYO K.K. No. 1 Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | For all designated states YOSHIDA KOGYO K.K. No. 1 Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kazumi, Kazai 3105-1, Kamikoizumi Namerikawa-shi Toyama-ken / JP | [1990/26] | Representative(s) | White, Martin David, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | White, Martin David, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 89313311.6 | 19.12.1989 | [1990/26] | Priority number, date | JP19880164223U | 19.12.1988 Original published format: JP 16422388 U | [1990/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0375379 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0375379 | Date: | 01.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A44B11/25 | [1990/26] | CPC: |
A44B11/263 (EP,US);
A44B11/25 (KR);
Y10T24/45623 (EP,US);
Y10T24/4566 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1990/26] | Title | German: | Schnalle | [1990/26] | English: | Buckle | [1990/26] | French: | Boucle | [1990/26] | Examination procedure | 27.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/47] | 01.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4035877 (BROWNSON IVAN F, et al); | [A]EP0046672 (LITTLE ROCK LTD [GB]); | [A]GB2099494 (KRAUSS JACK); | [AD]JPS60126010U ; | [A]EP0256398 (YOSHIDA KOGYO KK [JP]); | [XP]EP0309943 (YOSHIDA KOGYO KK [JP]) |