Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
20.10.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.1992 [1992/50] |
31.03.1992 | Change - representative | published on 20.05.1992 [1992/21] |
26.07.1991 | Publication of search report | published on 18.09.1991 [1991/38] |
12.05.1990 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.06.1990 [1990/26] |