EP0375425 - Projection pad incorporating a liquid crystal panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.1992 [1992/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Instruments Inc. 31-1, Kameido 6-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 136 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | For all designated states SEIKO INSTRUMENTS INC. 31-1, Kameido 6-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 136 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mandai, Masaaki c/o Seiko Instruments Inc. 31-1 Kameido 6-chome Koto-ku Tokyo / JP | [1990/26] | Representative(s) | Miller, Joseph, et al J. MILLER & CO. 34 Bedford Row, Holborn London WC1R 4JH / GB | [1992/21] |
Former [1990/26] | Caro, William Egerton J. MILLER & CO. Lincoln House 296-302 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 89313444.5 | 21.12.1989 | [1990/26] | Priority number, date | JP19880166219U | 22.12.1988 Original published format: JP 16621988 U | JP19880166220U | 22.12.1988 Original published format: JP 16622088 U | [1990/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0375425 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0375425 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1333, G03B21/16 | [1990/26] | CPC: |
G02F1/133308 (EP,US);
G02F1/133385 (EP,US);
G03B21/132 (EP,US);
G03B21/16 (EP,US);
G02F2201/36 (EP,US);
Y10S353/05 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/26] | Title | German: | Projektionsplatte mit einer Flüssigkristalltafel | [1990/26] | English: | Projection pad incorporating a liquid crystal panel | [1990/26] | French: | Support de projection comprenant un panneau à cristal liquide | [1990/26] | File destroyed: | 16.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 19.03.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/50] | 14.07.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.05.1992 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8707394 (HAASTERT BERND [DE]) |