EP0376674 - Spray urethane elastomer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, Inc. 2-5 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/23] | For all designated states MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, Inc. 2-5 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
Former [1990/27] | For all designated states MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS INC. No. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taniguchi, Kazuo 4-5-45 Dai Kamakura-Shi Kanagawa-Ken, 247 / JP | 02 /
Ogura, Tetsuyoshi 4-10-8 Hisagi Zushi-Shi Kanagawa-Ken, 249 / JP | 03 /
Imaoka, Kazuhiro 3-5 Shiomidai Isogo-Ku Yokohama-Shi Kanagawa-Ken, 235 / JP | 04 /
Sakaguchi, Hiroaki 1071-2, Nakano-Cho Sakae-Ku Yokohama-Shi Kanagawa-Ken, 247 / JP | [1990/27] | Representative(s) | Hayward, Denis Edward Peter, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Commonwealth House 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/27] | Hayward, Denis Edward Peter, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 89313583.0 | 27.12.1989 | [1990/27] | Priority number, date | JP19880328944 | 28.12.1988 Original published format: JP 32894488 | [1990/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0376674 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0376674 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/10, C08G18/50, B05D1/02 | [1990/27] | CPC: |
C08G18/4854 (EP,US);
C08G18/08 (KR);
C08G18/10 (EP,US);
C08G18/227 (EP,US);
C08G2150/50 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/6685 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/27] | Title | German: | Urethanelastomer zum Spritzen | [1990/27] | English: | Spray urethane elastomer | [1990/27] | French: | Elastomère d'uréthane pour pulvérisation | [1990/27] | Examination procedure | 08.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/27] | 02.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 22.03.1995 | NL | 22.03.1995 | [2003/11] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 22.03.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | US4267299 [ ] (OECHSLE III SIXTUS J); | EP0093861 [ ] (TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORP [US]); | WO8606387 [ ] (THERMOCELL DEV LTD [US]); | WO8707287 [ ] (AMERON INC [US]) |