EP0376687 - Paint stripping compositions and method of using same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.1991 [1991/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GLOBAL CHEMICAL SYSTEMS, INC. 12842 Pierce Street Pacoima California 91331 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/27] | For all designated states GLOBAL CHEMICAL SYSTEMS, INC. 12842 Pierce Street Pacoima California 91331 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davis, Elbert 30781 S. Coast Highway Villa 91 Laguna Beach California 92651 / US | [1990/27] | Representative(s) | Brown, David Leslie, et al Page Hargrave Southgate Whitefriars Lewins Mead, Bristol BS1 2NT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/27] | Brown, David Leslie, et al Page Hargrave Temple Gate House Temple Gate Bristol BS1 6PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 89313600.2 | 27.12.1989 | [1990/27] | Priority number, date | US19880291721 | 29.12.1988 Original published format: US 291721 | [1990/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0376687 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0376687 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C09D9/00 | [1990/27] | CPC: |
C09D9/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/27] | Title | German: | Farbentfernungsmittel und Verfahren unter Verwendung dieses Mittels | [1990/27] | English: | Paint stripping compositions and method of using same | [1990/27] | French: | Composition décapante de peinture et procédé l'utilisant | [1990/27] | File destroyed: | 08.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 09.02.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/40] | 03.05.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/40] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS61223071 ; | [A]JPS5218737 ; | [A]EP0011577 (SAINT GOBAIN [FR]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 63 (C-406)[2510]26th February 1987; & JP-A-61 223 071 (PENTEL K.K.) 03-10-1986 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 1, no. 59 (C-15), 8th June 1977page 588 C 77; & JP-A-52 18 737 (THE LION DENTIFRICE K.K.) 12-02-1977 |