EP0377330 - Multiple material processings system start-up [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 17.03.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pitney Bowes Inc. World Headquarters One Elmcroft Road Stamford, CT 06926-0700 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/28] | For all designated states PITNEY BOWES INC. World Headquarters One Elmcroft Stamford Connecticut 06926-0700 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Francisco, Robert 10 High Trail New Fairfield Connecticut 06812 / US | [1990/28] | Representative(s) | Görg, Klaus, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/52] | Görg, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/28] | Cook, Anthony John, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 89313671.3 | 28.12.1989 | [1990/28] | Priority number, date | US19880292059 | 30.12.1988 Original published format: US 292059 | [1990/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0377330 | Date: | 11.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0377330 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0377330 | Date: | 06.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/04, B07C1/00 | [1995/36] | CPC: |
G05B19/0428 (EP,US);
G05B19/0421 (EP,US);
G05B2219/2229 (EP,US);
G05B2219/25391 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/28] | G05B19/04 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1990/28] | Title | German: | Anfahren eines mehrfachen Dokumenten-Bearbeitungssystems | [1990/28] | English: | Multiple material processings system start-up | [1990/28] | French: | Démarrage d'un système de traitement multiple de documents | [1990/28] | Examination procedure | 11.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/01] | 26.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.06.1996
12.07.1996
ADMISSIBLE Société Secap 21, rue Alphonse le Gallo F-92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR Opponent's representative Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | 02
07.06.1996
24.06.1996
ADMISSIBLE Francotyp-Postalia GmbH Triftweg 21-26 D-16547 Birkenwerder / DE Opponent's representative Schaumburg, Karl-Heinz Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Eckert Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.06.1996
12.07.1996
ADMISSIBLE Société Secap 21, rue Alphonse le Gallo F-92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR Opponent's representative Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | ||
02
07.06.1996
24.06.1996
ADMISSIBLE Francotyp-Postalia GmbH Triftweg 21-26 D-16547 Birkenwerder / DE Opponent's representative Schaumburg, Karl-Heinz Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Eckert Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | 18.07.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.01.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.01.1998 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.11.1999 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2000/18] | 29.02.2000 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 23.03.1998 | Appeal received No. T0299/98 | 08.06.1998 | Statement of grounds filed | 16.11.1999 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 16.11.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.11.1999 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 06.09.1995 | CH | 31.12.1996 | LI | 31.12.1996 | [2003/11] |
Former [2002/45] | NL | 31.12.1995 | |
CH | 31.12.1996 | ||
LI | 31.12.1996 | ||
Former [2000/52] | CH | 06.09.1995 | |
LI | 06.09.1995 | ||
NL | 31.12.1995 | ||
Former [2000/50] | CH | 13.12.1995 | |
LI | 13.12.1995 | ||
NL | 31.12.1995 | ||
Former [2000/27] | NL | 31.12.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2128367 (XEROX CORP); | [A]GB2079004 (CANON KK); | [A]EP0192108 (LOVRENICH RODGER T); | [A]GB2067172 (DATA CARD CORP); | [A]GB1604328 (OWENS ILLINOIS INC); | [A]GB2048203 (PITNEY BOWES INC) | [A] - ELECTRO AND MINI/MICRO NORTHEAST , 23-25 APRIL 1985, NEW YORK, US pages 1 - 23 SHLOMO PRI-TAL & JOHN A. BLACK JR 'VME-System : The Most Popular 32-bit Architecture' | Examination | EP0180400 | EP0228182 | EP0187677 | EP0384497 |