EP0434876 - A computer system for unit trust processing functions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.04.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.1995 | Refusal of application | published on 24.05.1995 [1995/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PAXLEA LIMITED 26 Fitzwilliam Place Dublin 2 / IE | [1991/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bond, Anthony 210 Grange Road Rathfarnham Dublin 2 / IE | [1991/27] | Representative(s) | Prutton, Roger, et al MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/27] | Prutton, Roger, et al MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 89313709.1 | 29.12.1989 | [1991/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0434876 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/30 | [1991/27] | CPC: |
G06Q40/02 (EP);
G06F21/606 (EP);
G06F21/6218 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1991/27] | Title | German: | Rechnersystem zur Bearbeitung von Funktionen eines Treuhandvermögens | [1991/27] | English: | A computer system for unit trust processing functions | [1991/27] | French: | Système d'ordinateur pour le traitement des fonctions d'une société d'investissement à capital variable | [1991/27] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 02.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/27] | 09.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.10.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1995/21] | 29.10.1994 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1994 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4376978 ; | [AD]EP0278132 ; | [A]EP0068805 | [A] - DATAMATION, vol. 22, no. 7, July 1976, pages 54-56, Barrington, US; J.D. FOSTER: "Distributive processing for banking" | [A] - EVOLUTIONS IN COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS, PROCEEDINGS OF THE FOURTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER COMMUNICATION, Kyoto, 26th-29th September 1978, pages 467-472, North-Holland Publishing Co., Amsterdam, NL; Y. YOSHINO et al.: "New data communication system for nationwide banking activities and development of its software" |