EP0325533 - Spray bars for bitumen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.1992 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.1992 [1992/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A C M A R Société à Responsabilité Limitée Zone Industrielle 53400 Craon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/30] | For all designated states A C M A R Société à Responsabilité Limitée Zone Industrielle F-53400 Craon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Luzu, Bernard Les Hauts Châtaigniers Athee F-53400 Craon / FR | [1989/30] | Representative(s) | Phélip, Bruno, et al Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/31] | Phélip, Bruno, et al c/o Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 21, rue de La Rochefoucauld F-75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1989/30] | Bérogin, Francis CABINET HARLE & PHELIP 21, rue de la Rochefoucauld F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 89400149.4 | 18.01.1989 | [1989/30] | Priority number, date | FR19880000744 | 19.01.1988 Original published format: FR 8800744 | [1989/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0325533 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | E01C19/17 | [1989/30] | CPC: |
E01C19/176 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/30] | Title | German: | Spritzrampe für Bitumen | [1989/30] | English: | Spray bars for bitumen | [1989/30] | French: | Perfectionnement aux rampes de répandage de bitume | [1989/30] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 11.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/05] | 06.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/31] | 28.02.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1992 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE8631626U ; | [A]DE2323852 ; | [A]DE1577825 ; | [A]GB1041511 |