Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
25.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.04.1993 [1993/15] |
06.03.1992 | (Expected) grant | published on 22.04.1992 [1992/17] |
06.08.1990 | First examination report | |
24.06.1989 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 09.08.1989 [1989/32] |
24.06.1989 | Request for examination filed | published on 09.08.1989 [1989/32] |