EP0327450 - Variable power steering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.04.1993 [1993/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande Armée 75116 Paris / FR | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo 92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/32] | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande-Armée F-75116 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo F-92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Camus, Gérard 15, rue des Bouchères F-95240 Cormeilles-en-Parisis / FR | [1989/32] | Representative(s) | Boivin, Claude 9, rue Edouard-Charton 78000 Versailles / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/32] | Boivin, Claude 9, rue Edouard-Charton F-78000 Versailles / FR | Application number, filing date | 89400277.3 | 01.02.1989 | [1989/32] | Priority number, date | FR19880001542 | 02.02.1988 Original published format: FR 8801542 | [1989/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0327450 | Date: | 09.08.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0327450 | Date: | 22.04.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/06 | [1989/32] | CPC: |
B62D6/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1989/32] | Title | German: | Servolenkung mit variabler Lenkhilfe | [1989/32] | English: | Variable power steering | [1989/32] | French: | Direction assistée à assistance variable | [1989/32] | Examination procedure | 31.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/32] | 10.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4481866 ; | [A]FR2394437 ; | [A]FR2216162 |