EP0327469 - Process for defibrillating lignocellulosic material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEGHIN-SAY SOCIETE ANONYME F-59239 Thumeries / FR | [1989/35] |
Former [1989/32] | For all designated states BEGHIN-SAY SA F-59239 Thumeries / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Delaroche, Jean Paul 12 rue de Sally F-62112 Corbehem / FR | [1989/32] | Representative(s) | David, Daniel, et al Gevers France 41, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | David, Daniel, et al Bloch & Bonnétat 23bis, rue de Turin 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1989/32] | David, Daniel, et al KAYSERSBERG, Service Propriété Industrielle, 23 boulevard Georges Clemenceau F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 89400319.3 | 03.02.1989 | [1989/32] | Priority number, date | FR19880001333 | 05.02.1988 Original published format: FR 8801333 | [1989/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0327469 | Date: | 09.08.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0327469 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | D21B1/14, D21B1/02, D21D1/32 | [1989/32] | CPC: |
D21D1/32 (EP);
D21B1/021 (EP);
D21B1/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Zermahlen lignocelluloseartiger Materialien | [1989/32] | English: | Process for defibrillating lignocellulosic material | [1989/32] | French: | Procédé de défibrage d'une matière lignocellulosique | [1989/32] | Examination procedure | 08.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/32] | 24.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.04.1992 | ES | 15.04.1992 | GB | 15.04.1992 | GR | 15.04.1992 | IT | 15.04.1992 | NL | 15.04.1992 | SE | 15.04.1992 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 15.04.1992 | |
GB | 15.04.1992 | ||
GR | 15.04.1992 | ||
IT | 15.04.1992 | ||
NL | 15.04.1992 | ||
SE | 15.04.1992 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 15.04.1992 | |
GB | 15.04.1992 | ||
IT | 15.04.1992 | ||
NL | 15.04.1992 | ||
SE | 15.04.1992 | ||
Former [1993/14] | AT | 15.04.1992 | |
GB | 15.04.1992 | ||
NL | 15.04.1992 | ||
SE | 15.04.1992 | ||
Former [1993/03] | AT | 15.04.1992 | |
NL | 15.04.1992 | ||
SE | 15.04.1992 | ||
Former [1992/48] | NL | 15.04.1992 | |
SE | 15.04.1992 | ||
Former [1992/47] | SE | 15.04.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH166508 (ASPLUND ARNE J A [SE]); | [A]US1949534 (DOYLE WILLIAM T); | [A]FR1080539 ; | [A]FR1104813 ; | [X]GB752534 (ASCHAFFENBURGER ZELLSTOFFWERKE); | [AD]FR2418295 (CREUSOT LOIRE [FR]) |