EP0331548 - Checking method and apparatus for ultrasonic transducers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT DE RECHERCHES DE LA SIDERURGIE FRANCAISE (IRSID) 185, rue du Président Roosevelt F-78100 Saint-Germain-en-Laye / FR | For all designated states COMMUNAUTE EUROPEENNE DE L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE (EURATOM) Bâtiment Jean Monnet-DG XIII/A1 Plateau du Kirchberg L-2920 Luxembourg / LU | [1989/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Albert, Jean-Claude 26, Rue de la République F-78920 - Ecquevilly / FR | 02 /
Bancelin, Claude 14, Allée du Coteau F-78630 - Orgeval / FR | 03 /
Denis, René 26, Via Roma I-21020 Brebbia / IT | 04 /
Battagin, Gian-Pietro 10, Via Matté I-21021 - Angera / IT | [1989/36] | Representative(s) | Ventavoli, Roger, et al Usinor Immeuble La Pacific 11-13, Cours Valmy La Défense 7 92800 Puteaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/36] | Ventavoli, Roger, et al IRSID B.P. 64 Voie Romaine F-57210 Maizières-lès-Metz / FR | Application number, filing date | 89400394.6 | 13.02.1989 | [1989/36] | Priority number, date | FR19880002499 | 29.02.1988 Original published format: FR 8802499 | [1989/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0331548 | Date: | 06.09.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0331548 | Date: | 25.03.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01H3/00 | [1989/36] | CPC: |
G01H3/005 (EP);
G01H3/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zum Prüfen von Ultraschallwandlern | [1989/36] | English: | Checking method and apparatus for ultrasonic transducers | [1989/36] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de contrôle de traducteurs ultrasonores | [1989/36] | Examination procedure | 23.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/47] | 21.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.03.1992 | ES | 25.03.1992 | GB | 25.03.1992 | GR | 25.03.1992 | IT | 25.03.1992 | NL | 25.03.1992 | SE | 25.03.1992 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 25.03.1992 | |
GB | 25.03.1992 | ||
GR | 25.03.1992 | ||
IT | 25.03.1992 | ||
NL | 25.03.1992 | ||
SE | 25.03.1992 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 25.03.1992 | |
GB | 25.03.1992 | ||
IT | 25.03.1992 | ||
NL | 25.03.1992 | ||
SE | 25.03.1992 | ||
Former [1993/14] | AT | 25.03.1992 | |
GB | 25.03.1992 | ||
NL | 25.03.1992 | ||
SE | 25.03.1992 | ||
Former [1993/03] | AT | 25.03.1992 | |
NL | 25.03.1992 | ||
SE | 25.03.1992 | ||
Former [1992/48] | NL | 25.03.1992 | |
SE | 25.03.1992 | ||
Former [1992/47] | SE | 25.03.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2957340 (ROCHA HENRIQUE A F); | [A]US4064735 (HUTCHISON THOMAS SHERRET, et al); | [A]EP0140363 (ADVANCED TECH LAB [US]) | [ ] - ULTRASONICS, vol. 25, no. 5, septembre 1987, pages 308-309, Guildford, Surrey, GB; "Ultrasound safety standards assured" | [ ] - MELECON '85, vol. 2, 1985, pages 485-488, Elsevier Science Publishers B.V. (North-Hollan), Amsterdam, NL; R. M'HIRI et al.: "The visualization of ultrasonic fields" |