EP0331571 - Pipe made of composite layers with different modules of elasticity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.1993 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.08.1993 [1993/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 4, Avenue de Bois Préau 92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | For all designated states Société Anonyme dite : AEROSPATIALE SOCIETE NATIONALE INDUSTRIELLE 37, Boulevard de Montmorency 75016 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/36] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 4, Avenue de Bois Préau F-92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | ||
For all designated states Société Anonyme dite : AEROSPATIALE SOCIETE NATIONALE INDUSTRIELLE 37, Boulevard de Montmorency F-75016 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Odru, Pierre 7, rue Pablo Picasso F-94120 Fontenay Sous Bois / FR | 02 /
Sparks, Charles 19 bis, rue Pasteur F-78110 Le Vesinet / FR | 03 /
Auberon, Marcel Résidence Orion 14, allée du Passen F-33160 Le Maillan / FR | 04 /
Behar, Jacques 5, rue Thomas Edison F-33160 Saint Medard en Jalles / FR | [1989/36] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1990/18] |
Former [1989/36] | Aubel, Pierre Institut Français du Pétrole Département Brevets 4, avenue de Bois Préau F-92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Application number, filing date | 89400545.3 | 28.02.1989 | [1989/36] | Priority number, date | FR19880002560 | 02.03.1988 Original published format: FR 8802560 | [1989/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0331571 | Date: | 06.09.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0331571 | Date: | 26.08.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16L11/08 | [1989/36] | CPC: |
F16L11/083 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, NL [1989/36] | Title | German: | Verbundrohr aus Schichten verschiedener Elastizitätsmodule | [1989/36] | English: | Pipe made of composite layers with different modules of elasticity | [1989/36] | French: | Tube comportant des couches composites à module d'élasticité différent | [1989/36] | Examination procedure | 11.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/36] | 29.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1410263 ; | [A]FR2272321 (AEROQUIP GMBH [DE]); | [X]US4273160 (LOWLES DAVID C); | [A]DE3008808 (PHOENIX AG [DE]) | Examination | US3107698 | US3579402 | US4515737 | EP0244048 |