EP0387458 - Transport vehicle covered by a tarpaulin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.1994 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LIBNER CISM Zone Industrielle F-79400 Saint-Maixent l'Ecole / FR | [1992/37] |
Former [1992/23] | For all designated states SOCIETE D'EXPLOITATION DES CARROSSERIES JOSEPH LIBNER S.A.R.L. Zone Industrielle F-79400 St Maixent-l'Ecole / FR | ||
Former [1990/38] | For all designated states Libner, Joseph Casimir Saint Lin F-79420 Reffannes / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Libner, Joseph Casimir Saint Lin F-79420 Reffannes / FR | [1993/49] |
Former [1990/38] | 01 /
* * * | Representative(s) | CABINET BONNET-THIRION 12, Avenue de la Grande-Armée 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/38] | CABINET BONNET-THIRION 95 Boulevard Beaumarchais F-75003 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 89400722.8 | 15.03.1989 | [1990/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0387458 | Date: | 19.09.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0387458 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/06 | [1990/38] | CPC: |
B60J7/062 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT [1990/38] | Title | German: | Von einer Plane bedecktes Transportfahrzeug | [1990/38] | English: | Transport vehicle covered by a tarpaulin | [1990/38] | French: | Véhicule de transport couvert par bâche | [1990/38] | Examination procedure | 09.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/14] | 30.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1993 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 08.12.1993 | ES | 08.12.1993 | GB | 08.12.1993 | IT | 08.12.1993 | BE | 31.03.1994 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/42] | DE | 08.12.1993 | |
GB | 08.12.1993 | ||
IT | 08.12.1993 | ||
BE | 31.03.1994 | ||
Former [1995/12] | DE | 08.12.1993 | |
GB | 08.12.1993 | ||
BE | 31.03.1994 | ||
Former [1994/49] | DE | 08.12.1993 | |
GB | 08.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/32] | DE | 08.12.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2536709 ; | [Y]FR2024746 ; | DE1265601 [ ] |