EP0335765 - Catalytic system, its preparation process and use for preparing aldehyds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.1992 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4/8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92800 Puteaux Hauts-de-Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/04] | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4 & 8, Cours Michelet La Défense 10 F-92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
Former [1989/40] | For all designated states NORSOLOR Tour Aurore Place des Reflets F-92080 Paris la Défense 2- Cedex 5 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paumard, Eric 338, Rue de l'Abbé Touba F-57450 Cappel / FR | 02 /
Mutez, Sylvain 33, rue de Condemore 5 Hameau des Tréoles / FR | 03 /
Mortreux, André 17 Rue Gambetta F-59510 Hem / FR | 04 /
Petit, Françis 27 Allée de la Clairière F-59650 Villeneuve d'Ascq / FR | [1989/40] | Representative(s) | Rochet, Michel, et al ELF ATOCHEM S.A. Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8, Cours Michelet La Défense 10 - Cedex 42 92091 Paris-La-Défense / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | Rochet, Michel, et al ELF ATOCHEM S.A. Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8 Cours Michelet La Défense 10 - Cedex 42 92091 Paris-La-Défense / FR | ||
Former [1991/04] | Rochet, Michel, et al ELF ATOCHEM S.A. Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8, Cours Michelet La Défense 10 - Cedex 42 F-92091 Paris-La-Défense / FR | ||
Former [1989/40] | Dubost, Thierry c/o NORSOLOR Service Propriété Industrielle B.P. 57 F-62670 Mazingarbe / FR | Application number, filing date | 89400735.0 | 16.03.1989 | [1989/40] | Priority number, date | FR19880004192 | 30.03.1988 Original published format: FR 8804192 | [1989/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0335765 | Date: | 04.10.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0335765 | Date: | 14.08.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B01J31/24, B01J31/22, B01J31/16, C07C47/00 | [1989/40] | CPC: |
B01J31/188 (EP,US);
B01J31/2409 (EP,US);
C07C45/50 (EP,US);
B01J2231/321 (EP,US);
B01J2531/828 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C45/50, C07C47/228 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/40] | Title | German: | Katalytisches System, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung und seine Verwendung bei der Herstellung von Aldehyden | [1989/40] | English: | Catalytic system, its preparation process and use for preparing aldehyds | [1989/40] | French: | Système catalytique, son procédé de préparation et son application à la fabrication d'aldéhydes | [1989/40] | Examination procedure | 06.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/18] | 28.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0082576 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]); | [A]EP0158518 (HALCON SD GROUP INC [US]); | [A]EP0203286 (HOECHST AG [DE]) |