blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0337860

EP0337860 - Isothermal container with refrigerant tank and application to fresh product transport [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.04.1997
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CARBOXYQUE FRANCAISE
Tour Générale 5, place de la Pyramide
92800 Puteaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [1989/42]For all designated states
CARBOXYQUE FRANCAISE
Tour Générale 5, place de la Pyramide
F-92800 Puteaux / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Gibot, Claude
5-7, rue Gambetta
F-92.240 Malakoff / FR
[1989/42]
Representative(s)Jacobson, Claude, et al
L'AIR LIQUIDE
SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET
L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE
75, quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1989/42]Jacobson, Claude, et al
L'AIR LIQUIDE SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, quai d'Orsay
F-75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date89400968.707.04.1989
[1989/42]
Priority number, dateFR1988000465908.04.1988         Original published format: FR 8804659
[1989/42]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0337860
Date:18.10.1989
Language:FR
[1989/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0337860
Date:29.05.1991
Language:FR
[1991/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0337860
Date:22.05.1996
Language:FR
[1996/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.04.1991
ClassificationIPC:F25D3/12, B65D81/18, // B65D88/74
[1989/42]
CPC:
B65D81/18 (EP,US); F25D3/125 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1989/42]
TitleGerman:Isolier-Container mit Kältemittelbehälter und Verwendung beim Transport von frischen Produkten[1989/42]
English:Isothermal container with refrigerant tank and application to fresh product transport[1989/42]
French:Conteneur isotherme à réservoir de produit réfrigérant et application au transport de produits frais[1989/42]
Examination procedure12.04.1989Examination requested  [1989/42]
06.04.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.07.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.11.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.03.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.07.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.01.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.1994Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
20.11.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.11.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.01.1996Fee for grant paid
23.01.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination07.04.1994Appeal received No.  T0361/94
07.04.1994Statement of grounds filed
15.11.1994Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1994/47]
16.01.1995Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1995/03]
10.03.1995Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1995/10]
04.05.1995Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1995/18]
07.06.1995Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M01) [1995/23]
20.06.1995Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1995/25]
30.10.1995Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
Opposition(s)25.02.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1997/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
16.03.1994Renewal fee patent year 06
20.03.1995Renewal fee patent year 07
20.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US1998681  (LITTLEFORD JR JOHN S);
 [Y]FR2178437  (AIR FRANCE [FR]);
 [Y]FR2188122  (BURGER EISENWERKE AG [DE]);
 [AD]US1997936  (KIESEL JR WILLIAM F);
 [A]EP0166086  (FRANK MARTIN [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.