EP0338925 - False ceiling comprising a tensioned sheet secured along its edges to a support fixed to the wall of a room of a building [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.1993 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.03.1993 [1993/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scherrer, Fernand 2, rue Georges Bizet F-68170 Rixheim / FR | [1989/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/43] | Representative(s) | Bruder, Michel Cabinet Bruder 46 Rue Decamps F-75116 Paris / FR | [1989/43] | Application number, filing date | 89401092.5 | 19.04.1989 | [1989/43] | Priority number, date | FR19880005392 | 22.04.1988 Original published format: FR 8805392 | [1989/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0338925 | Date: | 25.10.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0338925 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | E04B9/22, B44C7/02 | [1992/15] | CPC: |
E04B9/303 (EP,US);
B44C7/022 (EP,US);
E04F13/005 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/43] | E04B5/60, B44C7/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/43] | Title | German: | Decke aus einer spannbaren Schicht, die an ihren Rändern an einem Tragrahmen eingehängt ist, der an den Wänden eines Wohnzimmers befestigt ist | [1989/43] | English: | False ceiling comprising a tensioned sheet secured along its edges to a support fixed to the wall of a room of a building | [1989/43] | French: | Faux-plafond constitué par une nappe tendue accrochée, le long de ses bords, à un support fixé aux murs d'une pièce d'un bâtiment | [1989/43] | Examination procedure | 18.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/11] | 11.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2202997 (ICI LTD [GB]); | [A]FR2310450 (ANTHONIOZ CAMILLE [FR]); | [A]FR2537112 (BERNARDY CLAUDE [FR]); | [A]FR2597906 (BOUTTIER DOMINIQUE [FR]) |