EP0340082 - Apparatus for cutting tubes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.05.1992 [1992/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LHOMME SA Route de Paris F-89140 Pont sur Yonne / FR | [1989/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Languillat, Jean-Paul Vallières F-89260 Thorigny sur Oreuse / FR | [1989/44] | Representative(s) | Chambon, Gérard Cabinet CHAMBON 16 Boulevard d'Ormesson 95880 Enghien-les-Bains / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/44] | Chambon, Gérard Cabinet CHAMBON 16 Boulevard d'Ormesson F-95880 Enghien-les-Bains / FR | Application number, filing date | 89401122.0 | 21.04.1989 | [1989/44] | Priority number, date | FR19880013157 | 07.10.1988 Original published format: FR 8813157 | FR19880005434 | 25.04.1988 Original published format: FR 8805434 | [1989/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0340082 | Date: | 02.11.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0340082 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B26D3/16, H01F7/06 | [1989/44] | CPC: |
B26D3/164 (EP,US);
B23Q3/1543 (EP,US);
Y10T82/16131 (EP,US);
Y10T82/16147 (EP,US);
Y10T82/16803 (EP,US);
Y10T82/16819 (EP,US);
Y10T82/16967 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/44] | Title | German: | Rohrschneidevorrichtung | [1989/44] | English: | Apparatus for cutting tubes | [1989/44] | French: | Dispositif de tronçonnage de tubes | [1989/44] | Examination procedure | 22.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/11] | 16.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1778323 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG); | [A]DE2015921 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG); | [AD]EP0225235 (LHOMME SA [FR]) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 25, no. 12, mai 1983, pages 6309-6310, New York, US; J.J. HAGOPIAN: "Disk coating orienting electromagnet" |