blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0345138

EP0345138 - X-ray isocentric support for four rotation axes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.09.1993
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.09.1993Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.11.1993 [1993/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC CGR S.A.
100, rue Camille-Desmoulins
92130 Issy les Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [1989/49]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC CGR S.A.
100, rue Camille-Desmoulins
F-92130 Issy les Moulineaux / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Lajus, Pierre CABINET BALLOT-SCHMIT
84, avenue Kléber
F-75116 Paris / FR
02 / Caugant, Jean CABINET BALLOT-SCHMIT
84, avenue Kléber
F-75116 Paris / FR
[1989/49]
Representative(s)Ballot, Paul Denis Jacques
Cabinet Ballot
122, rue Edouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [1992/14]Ballot, Paul Denis Jacques
Cabinet Ballot-Schmit, 7, rue Le Sueur
F-75116 Paris / FR
Former [1989/49]Ballot, Paul Denis Jacques
Cabinet Ballot-Schmit 7, rue le Sueur
F-75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date89401459.629.05.1989
[1989/49]
Priority number, dateFR1988000744203.06.1988         Original published format: FR 8807442
[1989/49]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0345138
Date:06.12.1989
Language:FR
[1989/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.10.1989
ClassificationIPC:A61B6/00
[1989/49]
CPC:
A61B6/4441 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT,   NL [1989/49]
TitleGerman:Röntgenisozentrisches Stativ für vier Rotationsachsen[1989/49]
English:X-ray isocentric support for four rotation axes[1989/49]
French:Statif de radiologie isocentrique à quatre axes de rotation[1989/49]
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Examination procedure26.12.1989Examination requested  [1990/11]
26.03.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.10.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.12.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.05.1993Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1993/45]
11.06.1993Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1993/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
24.04.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.199305   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4358856  (STIVENDER PAUL M, et al);
 [Y]EP0122849  (THOMSON CGR [FR]);
 [A]FR2588745  (THOMSON CGR [FR]);
 [Y]EP0224886  (SIEMENS AG [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.