EP0351260 - Cross-directional control of sheetmaking systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1994 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.09.1994 [1994/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEASUREX CORPORATION One Results Way Cupertino California 95014-5991 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/03] | For all designated states MEASUREX CORPORATION One Results Way Cupertino California 95014-5991 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Balakrishnan, Ramesh 524 Gerona Street Stanford California 94305 / US | [1990/03] | Representative(s) | Mongrédien, André, et al c/o SOCIETE DE PROTECTION DES INVENTIONS 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | [1990/03] | Application number, filing date | 89401665.8 | 14.06.1989 | [1990/03] | Priority number, date | US19880207412 | 15.06.1988 Original published format: US 207412 | [1990/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0351260 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0351260 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0351260 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/34, G01B7/02 | [1990/03] | CPC: |
G01N33/346 (EP,KR,US);
G01N23/16 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1990/03] | Title | German: | Bögenherstellungssysteme mit Kreuzprüfung | [1990/03] | English: | Cross-directional control of sheetmaking systems | [1990/03] | French: | Système de contrôle perpendiculaire pour un appareil de fabrication de feuilles | [1990/03] | Examination procedure | 04.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/22] | 18.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]NL6706427 ; | [A]US3673865 (MICHAELSEN ALFRED L); | [A]GB2170905 (CHAMPION INT CORP); | [Y]US4735087 (HOURANI MICHEL J [US], et al) | [Y] - JOURNAL OF PHYSICS E. SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS. vol. 14, no. 5, 1981, ISHING, BRISTOL GB pages 593 - 596; K W HARDACKER: "INSTRUMENT AND SPECIMEN SHAPE FOR BIAXIAL TESTING OF PAPER" |