EP0349429 - Process for the preparation of dispersible colloidal systems of amphiphilic lipids in the form of submicronic liposomes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 04.10.1996 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.1996 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 20.11.1996 [1996/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 15, Quai Anatole France 75700 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 15, Quai Anatole France F-75700 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [1990/01] | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE 1, rue Blaise-Pascal, B.P. 296 F-67008 Strasbourg Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stainmesse, Serge 8 rue Spinoza F-94600 Choisy Le Roi / FR | 02 /
Fessi, Hatem 9 rue Friant F-75007 Paris / FR | 03 /
Devissaguet, Jean-Philippe 14 Bd. d'Inkermann F-92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | 04 /
Puisieux, Francis 66 rue de Strasbourg F-94700 Maisons-Alfort / FR | [1990/01] | Representative(s) | Polus, Camille, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Polus, Camille, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1990/01] | Varady, Peter Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 89401857.1 | 28.06.1989 | [1990/01] | Priority number, date | FR19880008874 | 30.06.1988 Original published format: FR 8808874 | [1990/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0349429 | Date: | 03.01.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0349429 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0349429 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/08] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0349429 | Date: | 20.11.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/127 | [1990/01] | CPC: |
A61K9/1277 (EP);
A61K9/127 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung dispergierbarer kolloidaler Systeme aus amphiphilen Lipiden in Form von Liposomen in Submikrongrösse | [1990/01] | English: | Process for the preparation of dispersible colloidal systems of amphiphilic lipids in the form of submicronic liposomes | [1990/01] | French: | Procédé de préparation de systèmes colloidaux dispersibles de lipides amphiphiles sous forme de liposomes submicroniques | [1990/01] | Examination procedure | 25.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/50] | 29.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.11.1993
21.12.1993
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien TFP / Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | 02
22.11.1993
21.12.1993
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.11.1993
21.12.1993
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien TFP / Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
22.11.1993
21.12.1993
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Ludwigshafen -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
Former [1994/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.11.1993
21.12.1993
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien TFP / Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | 27.12.1993 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.06.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.07.1994 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.1994 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 30.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 20.02.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.03.1996 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 08.03.1996 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.03.1996 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.06.1996 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 26.08.1996 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2002319 (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE); | [X]EP0130577 (DAIICHI SEIYAKU CO [JP]); | [A]EP0190050 | [A] - STN FILE SUPPLIER (Karlsruhe) & FILE CA & CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 102, 1984, no. 138256u, New York, US; L. RYDHAG et al.: "Colloidal stability of liposomes", & SURFACTANTS SOLUTION, ÄPROC. INT. SYMP.Ü, 4TH, MEETING DATE 1982, VOLUME 3, 2039-57 |