Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
24.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.09.1992 [1992/38] |
03.07.1991 | First examination report | |
10.07.1990 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.08.1990 [1990/35] |
03.02.1990 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 21.03.1990 [1990/12] |