EP0356282 - Laser system especially for therapeutic use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 08.03.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCON PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED Sinserstrasse 47 CH-6330 Cham / CH | [1991/34] |
Former [1990/09] | For all designated states SYNTHELABO 22, avenue Galilée F-92350 Le Plessis-Robinson / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dacquay, Bruno 9, rue A. Varenne F-63210 Beaumont / FR | 02 /
Chaduc, Jean-Paul 162, rue du Courage F-63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | [1991/52] |
Former [1990/09] | 01 /
Dacquay, Bruno 9, rue A. Varenne F-63210 Beaumont / FR | ||
02 /
Chaduc, Jean-Paul 162, rue du Courage F-6300 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | Representative(s) | Bonnetat, Christian Gevers France 41, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/39] | Bonnetat, Christian CABINET BONNETAT 23, Rue de St. Pétersbourg F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1990/09] | Bonnetat, Christian CABINET BONNETAT 23, Rue de St. Pétersbourg F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 89402158.3 | 28.07.1989 | [1990/09] | Priority number, date | FR19880010416 | 02.08.1988 Original published format: FR 8810416 | [1990/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0356282 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0356282 | Date: | 27.12.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61F9/00 | [1990/09] | CPC: |
A61F9/008 (EP);
A61B2018/2025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/09] | Title | German: | Lasereinrichtung, insbesondere für therapeutische Verwendung | [1990/09] | English: | Laser system especially for therapeutic use | [1990/09] | French: | Dispositif à laser, notamment pour applications thérapeutiques | [1990/09] | Examination procedure | 12.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/19] | 09.08.1990 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 31.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.1990 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 09.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.08.1992
18.08.1992
ADMISSIBLE Firma Carl Zeiss Patentabteilung D-73446 Oberkochen / DE | [1992/41] | 03.11.1992 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.04.1993 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 09.12.1993 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1994/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 29.03.1992 | AT | 28.07.1992 | ES | 29.07.1992 | SE | 29.07.1992 | BE | 31.07.1992 | CH | 31.07.1992 | LI | 31.07.1992 | LU | 31.07.1992 | NL | 01.02.1993 | DE | 01.04.1993 | GB | 28.07.1993 | [2004/51] |
Former [2004/38] | AT | 28.07.1992 | |
ES | 29.07.1992 | ||
SE | 29.07.1992 | ||
BE | 31.07.1992 | ||
CH | 31.07.1992 | ||
LI | 31.07.1992 | ||
LU | 31.07.1992 | ||
NL | 01.02.1993 | ||
DE | 01.04.1993 | ||
GB | 28.07.1993 | ||
Former [2002/42] | AT | 28.07.1992 | |
SE | 29.07.1992 | ||
BE | 31.07.1992 | ||
CH | 31.07.1992 | ||
LI | 31.07.1992 | ||
LU | 31.07.1992 | ||
NL | 01.02.1993 | ||
DE | 01.04.1993 | ||
GB | 28.07.1993 | ||
Former [2002/16] | CH | 27.12.1991 | |
LI | 27.12.1991 | ||
AT | 28.07.1992 | ||
SE | 29.07.1992 | ||
BE | 31.07.1992 | ||
LU | 31.07.1992 | ||
NL | 01.02.1993 | ||
DE | 01.04.1993 | ||
GB | 28.07.1993 | ||
Former [1999/52] | AT | 28.07.1992 | |
SE | 29.07.1992 | ||
BE | 31.07.1992 | ||
CH | 31.07.1992 | ||
LI | 31.07.1992 | ||
LU | 31.07.1992 | ||
NL | 01.02.1993 | ||
DE | 01.04.1993 | ||
GB | 28.07.1993 | ||
Former [1994/41] | AT | 28.07.1992 | |
SE | 29.07.1992 | ||
BE | 31.07.1992 | ||
CH | 31.07.1992 | ||
LI | 31.07.1992 | ||
NL | 01.02.1993 | ||
DE | 01.04.1993 | ||
GB | 28.07.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | AT | 28.07.1992 | |
SE | 29.07.1992 | ||
BE | 31.07.1992 | ||
CH | 31.07.1992 | ||
LI | 31.07.1992 | ||
NL | 01.02.1993 | ||
DE | 01.04.1993 | ||
Former [1993/40] | SE | 29.07.1992 | |
BE | 31.07.1992 | ||
CH | 31.07.1992 | ||
LI | 31.07.1992 | ||
NL | 01.02.1993 | ||
DE | 01.04.1993 | ||
Former [1993/23] | SE | 29.07.1992 | |
BE | 31.07.1992 | ||
CH | 31.07.1992 | ||
LI | 31.07.1992 | ||
NL | 01.02.1993 | ||
Former [1993/23] | SE | 29.07.1992 | |
BE | 31.07.1992 | ||
NL | 01.02.1993 | ||
Former [1993/21] | SE | 29.07.1992 | |
BE | 31.07.1992 | ||
Former [1993/19] | SE | 29.07.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0007256 (DANIELE SYLVIE ARON ROSA [FR], et al); | [A]GB2074343 (INST OF OPHTHALMOLOGY); | [A]DE3518256 (ESPERANCE FRANCIS A L) |