Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0356329
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
06.06.1997 |
Patent maintained (B2 publication) |
published on 23.07.1997 [1997/30] |
07.03.1997 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition |
|
07.03.1997 |
Communication/fee (R.58(5) EPC1973) |
|
20.11.1996 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition |
|
20.04.1996 |
Communication of examination report in opposition |
|
02.02.1996 |
Communication of examination report in opposition |
|
04.08.1994 |
Opposition filed |
published on 21.09.1994 [1994/38] |
23.09.1993 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 10.11.1993 [1993/45] |
03.02.1993 |
First examination report |
|
27.03.1990 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.05.1990 [1990/20] |
13.01.1990 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.02.1990 [1990/09] |